MI SB0877 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Assigned Pa 0213'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Assigned Pa 0213'14 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Recreation; trails; statewide trail network; include Pure Michigan Trails and provide for trails advisory council oversight of water trails. Amends secs. 72110, 72110a & 72115 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.72110 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5553'14, HB 5559'14, SB 0873'14, SB 0875'14, SB 0876'14
Title
Recreation; trails; statewide trail network; include Pure Michigan Trails and provide for trails advisory council oversight of water trails. Amends secs. 72110, 72110a & 72115 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.72110 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5553'14, HB 5559'14, SB 0873'14, SB 0875'14, SB 0876'14
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Casperson [R] | Sen. Goeff Hansen [R] | Sen. John Moolenaar [R] | Sen. Arlan Meekhof [R] |
Sen. Michael Kowall [R] | Sen. Michael Green [R] | Sen. Darwin Booher [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 475 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 475 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 397 (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 193 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 475 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 397 (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 193 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-16 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0213'14 With Immediate Effect |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/26/2014 @ 1:30 Pm |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/26/2014 @ 11:38 Am |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/25/2014 @ 3:58 Pm |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Roll Call # 475 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2014-06-12 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2014-06-12 | Senate | House Inserted Full Title |
2014-06-11 | House | Returned To Senate |
2014-06-11 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2014-06-11 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 397 Yeas 108 Nays 2 |
2014-06-11 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-06-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-06-10 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2014-06-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-05-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-05-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2014-04-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Tourism |
2014-04-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-04-23 | House | Received On 04/23/2014 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 193 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Outdoor Recreation And Tourism |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Thomas Casperson |