MI SB0883 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Assigned Pa 165'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Assigned Pa 165'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; supplemental; Michigan natural resources trust fund; provide appropriations for fiscal year 2017-2018. Creates appropriation act.
Title
Appropriations; supplemental; Michigan natural resources trust fund; provide appropriations for fiscal year 2017-2018. Creates appropriation act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 330 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 276 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 276 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Senate | Assigned Pa 165'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/4/2018 @ 10:34 Am |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/3/2018 @ 8:27 Pm |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Presented To Governor 5/22/2018 @ 3:34 Pm |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2018-05-16 | House | Transmitted |
2018-05-16 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 330 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2018-05-16 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-05-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-05-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2018-05-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-05-08 | House | Received On 05/03/2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 276 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Darwin Booher |