MI SB0907 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Construction: other; exclusion of temporary locking devices or systems installed in child care centers; update under the fire prevention code. Amends sec. 22 of 1941 PA 207 (MCL 29.22). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0906'24, SB 0908'24
Title
Construction: other; exclusion of temporary locking devices or systems installed in child care centers; update under the fire prevention code. Amends sec. 22 of 1941 PA 207 (MCL 29.22). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0906'24, SB 0908'24
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 293 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2024-06-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-06-26 | House | Received On 06/26/2024 |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 293 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2024-06-25 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2024-06-25 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2024-06-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2024-06-25 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Affairs |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Jeremy Moss |
Same As/Similar To
SB0906 (Same As) 2024-06-26 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
SB0908 (Same As) 2024-06-26 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
SB0908 (Same As) 2024-06-26 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform