MI SB0911 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Assigned Pa 0230'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Assigned Pa 0230'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Retirement: state employees; retirants hired by the Michigan unemployment insurance agency or the Michigan occupational safety and health administration; allow under certain circumstances without forfeiting retirement benefits. Amends sec. 68c of 1943 PA 240 (MCL 38.68c). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0886'20
Title
Retirement: state employees; retirants hired by the Michigan unemployment insurance agency or the Michigan occupational safety and health administration; allow under certain circumstances without forfeiting retirement benefits. Amends sec. 68c of 1943 PA 240 (MCL 38.68c). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0886'20
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 407 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 483 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 397 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 483 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 397 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0230'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/20/2020 05:12 Pm |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Approved By Governor 10/20/2020 04:50 Pm |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Presented To Governor 10/20/2020 04:13 Pm |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 407 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2020-10-14 | Senate | House Substitute (h-3) Concurred In |
2020-10-14 | House | Returned To Senate |
2020-10-14 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2020-10-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 483 Yeas 101 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 8 |
2020-10-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-10-14 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-10-14 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-10-14 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted |
2020-10-14 | House | Substitute (h-1) Not Adopted |
2020-10-14 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-10-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-10-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-10-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-10-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-10-08 | House | Received On 10/08/2020 |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 397 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) As Amended |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) As Amended Concurred In |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) And Amendment(s) |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Ken Horn |