MI SB0926 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-26 - Ordered Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on September 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-26 - Ordered Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Gaming: lottery; expenditures to the compulsive gaming prevention fund; modify. Amends sec. 41 of 1972 PA 239 (MCL 432.41).
Title
Gaming: lottery; expenditures to the compulsive gaming prevention fund; modify. Amends sec. 41 of 1972 PA 239 (MCL 432.41).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-09-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 298 (Y: 58 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-09-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 258 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-09-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 258 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-26 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2024-09-26 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2024-09-25 | House | Returned To Senate |
2024-09-25 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2024-09-25 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 298 Yeas 58 Nays 51 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2024-09-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2024-09-25 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2024-09-25 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-09-25 | House | Read A Second Time |
2024-09-25 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-09-25 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2024-06-20 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2024-06-20 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-06-20 | House | Received On 06/20/2024 |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 258 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Sarah Anthony |