MI SB1026 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-19 - Referred To Committee On Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-19 - Referred To Committee On Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; tax increment financing; tax increment finance authorities into a single act; provide for. Creates new act & repeals (See bill).
Title
Economic development; tax increment financing; tax increment finance authorities into a single act; provide for. Creates new act & repeals (See bill).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 541 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2016-10-19 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-10-19 | House | Received On 10/18/2016 |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 541 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Adopted |
2016-09-21 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2016-09-21 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2016-09-21 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-09-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2016-09-21 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-09-21 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And International Investment |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Ken Horn |