MN HF1 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-26 - Author added Fabian.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-26 - Author added Fabian.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Health insurance premium temporary payment program provided, health maintenance organization requirements modified, health insurance provisions modified, reports required, and money appropriated.
Title
Health insurance premium temporary payment program provided, health maintenance organization requirements modified, health insurance provisions modified, reports required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-11 - House - House: Recall and Re-refer (Y: 55 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-11 - House - House: Recall and Re-refer (Y: 54 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-05 - House - House: Suspension of Rules (Y: 75 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-11 - House - House: Recall and Re-refer (Y: 54 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-01-05 - House - House: Suspension of Rules (Y: 75 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-26 | House | Author added Fabian. |
2017-01-17 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2017-01-17 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2017-01-12 | House | Author added Dettmer. |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF1 |
2017-01-12 | House | Second reading |
2017-01-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2017-01-11 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion did not prevail Health and Human Services Finance |
2017-01-11 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion did not prevail Taxes |
2017-01-11 | House | Author added Bliss. |
2017-01-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2017-01-09 | House | Authors added Swedzinski, Loonan, Uglem, Franke, Albright, Layman, Newberger, Jurgens, Torkelson, and Lueck. |
2017-01-05 | House | Motion did not prevail 90 votes required for suspension of rules |
2017-01-05 | House | Motion to suspend rules |
2017-01-05 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF1 (Similar To) 2017-01-30 - Secretary of State Chapter 2 01/26/17