MN HF10 | 2021 | 92nd Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - Secretary of State Chapter 5
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - Secretary of State Chapter 5
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus transportation bill.
Title
Omnibus transportation bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House: Passage (Y: 112 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-23 - House - House: Appeal the ruling of the Speaker (Y: 68 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-23 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 61 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-23 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 61 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-23 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 60 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-23 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 59 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-23 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 59 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-23 - House - House: Petersburg motion Re-Referral (Y: 58 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-23 - House - House: Passage (Y: 112 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-23 - House - House: Appeal the ruling of the Speaker (Y: 68 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 62 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-23 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 61 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-23 - House - House: 69 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 61 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-23 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 60 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-23 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 59 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-23 - House - House: 70 - Amendment - Nays (Y: 59 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-23 - House - House: Petersburg motion Re-Referral (Y: 58 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Secretary of State Chapter 5 | |
2021-06-26 | Governor's action Approval | |
2021-06-26 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2021-06-26 | Governor approval | |
2021-06-25 | House | Returned from Senate |
2021-06-24 | Presented to Governor | |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Urgency declared rules suspended |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Taken from table |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Laid on table |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-06-23 | House | Bill was passed |
2021-06-23 | House | Third reading |
2021-06-23 | House | Point of order raised, ruled well taken |
2021-06-23 | House | Amendments offered |
2021-06-23 | House | Motion did not prevail |
2021-06-23 | House | Motion to re-refer Transportation Finance and Policy |
2021-06-21 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, June 23, 2021 |
2021-06-21 | House | Second reading |
2021-06-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2021-06-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF10 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - HF passed, no substitution HF10