MN HF1097 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-30 - House: Authors added Smith and Atkins
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-30 - House: Authors added Smith and Atkins
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Aircraft cockpits secured against lasers.
Title
Aircraft cockpits secured against lasers.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Atkins [D] | Rep. Michael Beard [R] | Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Debra Hilstrom [D] |
Rep. Steve Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-30 | House: Authors added Smith and Atkins | |
2009-04-28 | House: Recalled by Chair Finance | |
2009-03-23 | House: Authors added Beard and Hilstrom | |
2009-03-18 | House: Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Finance | |
2009-03-18 | House: Referred by Chair to Public Safety Finance Division | |
2009-02-26 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Policy and Oversight |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/revisor/pages/search_status/status_detail.php?b=House&f=HF1097&ssn=0&y=2009 |
Text | http://wdoc.house.leg.state.mn.us/leg/LS86/HF1097.0.pdf |