MN HF1143 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - Author changed West as chief author.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - Author changed West as chief author.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Summit Academy OIC funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Summit Academy OIC funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Nolan West [R] | Rep. Pat Garofalo [R] | Rep. Tim Mahoney [D] | Rep. John Lesch [D] |
Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Mike Nelson [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | House | Author changed West as chief author. |
2017-02-16 | House | Author added Lee. |
2017-02-15 | House | Author added Nelson. |
2017-02-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1505 (Similar To) 2017-03-06 - Authors added Hayden; Champion