MN HF1175 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Authors added Hamilton and Feist
Pending: House Human Services Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Authors added Hamilton and Feist
Pending: House Human Services Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COVID-19; home and community-based service providers established, and money appropriated.
Title
COVID-19; home and community-based service providers established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | Authors added Hamilton and Feist |
2021-03-04 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1319 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Author added Putnam