MN HF1175 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-27 - Author added Pursell
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-27 - Author added Pursell
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medical assistance coverage modified for special education school social work services.
Title
Medical assistance coverage modified for special education school social work services.
Sponsors
Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] | Rep. Luke Frederick [D] | Rep. Laurie Pryor [D] | Rep. Debra Kiel [R] |
Rep. Amanda Hemmingsen-Jaeger [D] | Rep. Mary Clardy [D] | Rep. Kristi Pursell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | House | Author added Pursell |
2023-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Finance |
2023-03-09 | House | Author added Clardy |
2023-02-27 | House | Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2023-02-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1028 (Similar To) 2023-03-09 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Education Finance