MN HF12 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Author added Richardson
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-29 - Author added Richardson
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Eviction and nonrenewal of lease procedures provided for during and after a peacetime emergency, expungement of eviction actions filed during and after a peacetime emergency allowed, and home foreclosures and contract for deed termination prevented during and after a peacetime emergency.
Title
Eviction and nonrenewal of lease procedures provided for during and after a peacetime emergency, expungement of eviction actions filed during and after a peacetime emergency allowed, and home foreclosures and contract for deed termination prevented during and after a peacetime emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Author added Richardson |
2021-03-25 | House | Author added Berg |
2021-03-22 | House | Author added Hollins |
2021-03-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2021-03-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2021-02-10 | House | Author added Freiberg |
2021-02-04 | House | Author added Hanson, J. |
2021-02-01 | House | Author added Long |
2021-01-28 | House | Authors added Fischer and Thompson |
2021-01-25 | House | Authors added Hassan |
2021-01-21 | House | Authors added Jordan and Bahner |
2021-01-14 | House | Author added Vang |
2021-01-11 | House | Authors added Olson, L.; Frazier; Noor; Becker-Finn; Reyer |
2021-01-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF491 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - Author added Pappas
SF1470 (Similar To) 2021-05-12 - House conferees Hausman; Howard; Theis
SF1470 (Similar To) 2021-05-12 - House conferees Hausman; Howard; Theis