MN HF1247 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-08 - Author added Kraft
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-08 - Author added Kraft
Pending: House Legacy Funding Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Science Museum of Minnesota funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Science Museum of Minnesota funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-08 | House | Author added Kraft |
2023-02-06 | House | Author added Hollins |
2023-02-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Legacy Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF407 (Similar To) 2023-01-19 - Referred to Environment, Climate, and Legacy