MN HF1268 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-27 - House: HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-27 - House: HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Employee fitness and wellness activities authorized in state space.
Title
Employee fitness and wellness activities authorized in state space.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Buesgens [R] | Rep. Rob Eastlund [R] | Rep. Phyllis Kahn [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] |
Rep. Michael Paymar [D] | Rep. Jeanne Poppe [D] | Sen. Roger Reinert [D] | Rep. Ryan Winkler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-27 | House: HF indefinitely postponed | |
2009-04-27 | House: Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register | |
2009-04-25 | House: Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF1464 | |
2009-04-14 | House: Second reading | |
2009-04-14 | House: Committee report, to pass | |
2009-04-02 | House: Committee report, to pass and re-refer to Civil Justice | |
2009-03-09 | House: Author added Reinert | |
2009-03-05 | House: Authors added Lillie and Kahn | |
2009-03-02 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Operations Reform, Technology and Elections |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/revisor/pages/search_status/status_detail.php?b=House&f=HF1268&ssn=0&y=2009 |
Text | http://wdoc.house.leg.state.mn.us/leg/LS86/HF1268.0.pdf |