MN HF127 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Author added Boe
Pending: House Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Author added Boe
Pending: House Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Youth employment; 16- and 17-year-olds working in or around a construction or building project requirements modified, and rulemaking authorized.
Title
Youth employment; 16- and 17-year-olds working in or around a construction or building project requirements modified, and rulemaking authorized.
Sponsors
Rep. Kristin Robbins [R] | Rep. Lisa Demuth [R] | Rep. Marion O'Neill [R] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] |
Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Author added Boe |
2021-03-11 | House | Author added Bennett |
2021-01-19 | House | Author added Theis |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF134 (Similar To) 2021-02-04 - Author added Koran