MN HF1307 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Authors added Her and Long
Pending: House Preventive Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Authors added Her and Long
Pending: House Preventive Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Healthy children's meal requirements established at restaurants to be implemented on a phased-in basis, and enforcement provided.
Title
Healthy children's meal requirements established at restaurants to be implemented on a phased-in basis, and enforcement provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Samantha Vang [D] | Rep. Steve Elkins [D] | Rep. Kaela Berg [D] |
Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Jamie Long [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Authors added Her and Long |
2021-03-15 | House | Author added Berg |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred by Chair to Preventive Health Policy Division |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Elkins |
2021-02-22 | House | Author added Vang |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1363 (Similar To) 2021-03-24 - Withdrawn and returned to author