MN HF1311 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Author stricken Johnson
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Author stricken Johnson
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Maximum grant or loan amount for workforce housing projects modified, and money appropriated.
Title
Maximum grant or loan amount for workforce housing projects modified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Norris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Author stricken Johnson |
2023-02-09 | House | Author added Johnson |
2023-02-06 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF989 (Similar To) 2023-03-01 - Author added Hauschild