MN HF1345 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-18 - House: House rule 4.20, interim disposition of bills, returned to Commerce and Labor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-18 - House: House rule 4.20, interim disposition of bills, returned to Commerce and Labor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Claims processing practices by third-party administrators of health coverage plans prohibited, health claims clearinghouses regulated, time limit provided for insurer of audits of health claims payments, and deceased professional's surviving spouse permitted to retain ownership of professional firm for up to one year after the death.
Title
Claims processing practices by third-party administrators of health coverage plans prohibited, health claims clearinghouses regulated, time limit provided for insurer of audits of health claims payments, and deceased professional's surviving spouse permitted to retain ownership of professional firm for up to one year after the death.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Rep. Joe Atkins [D] | Rep. Diane Loeffler [D] | Rep. Maria Ruud [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-18 | House: House rule 4.20, interim disposition of bills, returned to Commerce and Labor | |
2009-04-01 | House: Second reading | |
2009-04-01 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended | |
2009-03-24 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Labor | |
2009-03-05 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Care and Human Services Policy and Oversight |