MN HF136 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Author added Hassan
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Author added Hassan
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interpretation services required for language minority members on political party caucus materials.
Title
Interpretation services required for language minority members on political party caucus materials.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Samantha Vang [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Athena Hollins [D] |
Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] | Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Hassan |
2021-01-21 | House | Author added Stephenson |
2021-01-19 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF817 (Similar To) 2021-02-17 - Author added Carlson