MN HF1408 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-14 - Author added Erhardt.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-14 - Author added Erhardt.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Water conditioning installation requirements modified.
Title
Water conditioning installation requirements modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim O'Driscoll [R] | Rep. Joe Hoppe [R] | Rep. Joe Atkins [D] | Rep. Joe Schomacker [R] |
Rep. Ron Erhardt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Author added Erhardt. |
2016-03-21 | House | Author added Schomacker. |
2015-03-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF1689 (Similar To) 2015-03-12 - Referred to Jobs, Agriculture and Rural Development