MN HF1413 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Author added Hamilton
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Author added Hamilton
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medical cannabis program operation modified.
Title
Medical cannabis program operation modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Pat Garofalo [R] | Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. Jeremy Munson [R] |
Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Author added Hamilton |
2021-03-04 | House | Authors added Albright and Munson |
2021-03-01 | House | Author added Garofalo |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1179 (Similar To) 2021-05-15 - Author added Howe