MN HF1416 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - Author added Lien.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - Author added Lien.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Unemployment insurance employer tax rate reduced.
Title
Unemployment insurance employer tax rate reduced.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | Author added Lien. |
2015-03-09 | House | Author added Fischer. |
2015-03-05 | House | Authors added Ward and Isaacson. |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1320 (Similar To) 2015-03-04 - Referred to Jobs, Agriculture and Rural Development