MN HF1434 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-13 - Author added Hansen, R.
Pending: House Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-13 - Author added Hansen, R.
Pending: House Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Parental contribution fees eliminated for services for children with disabilities.
Title
Parental contribution fees eliminated for services for children with disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | House | Author added Hansen, R. |
2023-03-06 | House | Author added Pursell |
2023-03-06 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Human Services Finance |
2023-03-02 | House | Authors added Curran and Hicks |
2023-02-27 | House | Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2023-02-20 | House | Authors added Coulter and Rehm |
2023-02-16 | House | Authors added Backer, Newton, and Freiberg |
2023-02-15 | House | Authors added Keeler, Moller, Becker-Finn, Koegel, and Pryor |
2023-02-13 | House | Authors added Norris; Kraft; Long |
2023-02-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1201 (Similar To) 2023-02-02 - Referred to Human Services