MN HF1495 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Author added Vang
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Author added Vang
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mental health services provisions modified.
Title
Mental health services provisions modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Author added Vang |
2021-03-04 | House | Author added Franke |
2021-03-03 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Human Services Finance and Policy |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred by Chair to Behavioral Health Policy Division |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1028 (Similar To) 2021-03-15 - Author added Dornink