MN HF1500 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-17 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-17 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Chemical and mental health services changes made, and rate reforms made.
Title
Chemical and mental health services changes made, and rate reforms made.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-17 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2011-05-17 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2011-05-17 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2011-05-16 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF1285 |
2011-05-04 | House | Second reading |
2011-05-04 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2011-05-02 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Policy and Finance |
2011-04-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |