MN HF1500 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-13 - Author added Lillie.
Pending: House Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-13 - Author added Lillie.
Pending: House Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Crime victim support grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Crime victim support grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | House | Author added Lillie. |
2015-04-09 | House | Author added Rosenthal. |
2015-03-16 | House | Author added Freiberg. |
2015-03-11 | House | Author added McNamara. |
2015-03-09 | House | Author added Fischer and Ward. |
2015-03-05 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Crime Prevention Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF210 (Similar To) 2015-01-20 - Referred to Finance