MN HF1506 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Lueck
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Author added Lueck
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State mineral and water resources funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
State mineral and water resources funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Author added Lueck |
2021-03-04 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
2021-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1389 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance