MN HF1529 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-10 - Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Human Services Finance and Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-10 - Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Human Services Finance and Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hospital bed license transfer requirements modified after hospital closure, and hospital construction moratorium exception conditions monitoring and enforcement established.
Title
Hospital bed license transfer requirements modified after hospital closure, and hospital construction moratorium exception conditions monitoring and enforcement established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Human Services Finance and Policy |
2021-02-26 | House | Referred by Chair to Behavioral Health Policy Division |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1435 (Similar To) 2021-03-15 - Author added Wiklund