MN HF1607 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Author added Lee.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Author added Lee.
Pending: House Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Housing trust fund creation by local governments authorized, reports required, and money appropriated.
Title
Housing trust fund creation by local governments authorized, reports required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | House | Author added Lee. |
2017-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
2017-03-02 | House | Author added Theis. |
2017-03-01 | House | Author added Pierson. |
2017-02-27 | House | Authors added Clark and Bly. |
2017-02-23 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1389 (Similar To) 2017-02-23 - Referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance