MN HF1647 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-16 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-16 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Patient allowed to enjoin collection actions taken by a nonprofit hospital if the hospital has failed to provide a financial assistance policy.
Title
Patient allowed to enjoin collection actions taken by a nonprofit hospital if the hospital has failed to provide a financial assistance policy.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Hilstrom [D] | Rep. Joe Atkins [D] | Rep. Ben Lien [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2015-04-16 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF1741 |
2015-04-07 | House | Second reading |
2015-04-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2015-03-25 | House | Author added Lien. |
2015-03-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices |
2015-03-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF1741 (Similar To) 2015-05-08 - Secretary of State Chapter 20 05/07/15