MN HF1656 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Outdoor recreation grant provisions modified, game and fish law modified, beaver and beaver dams causing damage removal provided, insecticides in wildlife management areas banned, and rulemaking required.
Title
Outdoor recreation grant provisions modified, game and fish law modified, beaver and beaver dams causing damage removal provided, insecticides in wildlife management areas banned, and rulemaking required.
Sponsors
Rep. John Persell [D] | Rep. Dale Lueck [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2096 (Similar To) 2019-03-21 - Second reading