MN HF1695 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-13 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Human Services Finance
Pending: House Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-13 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Human Services Finance
Pending: House Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Service Employees International Union (SEIU) healthcare agreement ratified.
Title
Service Employees International Union (SEIU) healthcare agreement ratified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Human Services Finance |
2023-03-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government Finance and Policy |
2023-03-02 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Human Services Policy |
2023-02-20 | House | Authors added Norris and Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2023-02-15 | House | Author added Jordan |
2023-02-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1616 (Similar To) 2023-03-06 - Second reading