MN HF17 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-18 - Motion did not prevail
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-18 - Motion did not prevail
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Help America Vote Act appropriations authorized for purposes of modernizing, securing, and updating statewide voter registration system and for cybersecurity upgrades.
Title
Help America Vote Act appropriations authorized for purposes of modernizing, securing, and updating statewide voter registration system and for cybersecurity upgrades.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - House - House: H.F. NO. 17 (Y: 47 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | House | Motion did not prevail |
2019-02-18 | House | Motion to suspend rules |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-01-16 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Government Operations |
2019-01-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Subcommittee on Elections |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF241 (Similar To) 2019-02-27 - (Non-revisor companion) HF14