MN HF1720 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Author added Hamilton
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Author added Hamilton
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Railroad reconstruction or replacement expenditure credit provided.
Title
Railroad reconstruction or replacement expenditure credit provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. John Heinrich [R] | Rep. Paul Torkelson [R] | Rep. Jeff Backer [R] |
Sen. Jordan Rasmusson [R] | Rep. Jon Koznick [R] | Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Author added Hamilton |
2022-02-17 | House | Author added Davids (as chief) |
2022-01-31 | House | Author added Stephenson |
2021-04-15 | House | Author added Koznick |
2021-04-12 | House | Author added Rasmusson |
2021-04-06 | House | Author added Backer |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF1501 (Similar To) 2021-04-13 - Author added Clausen