MN HF1723 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mississippi River Parkway Commission member terms modified, commission expiration date repealed, and trunk highway fund appropriations modified.
Title
Mississippi River Parkway Commission member terms modified, commission expiration date repealed, and trunk highway fund appropriations modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | House | Referred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF1268 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy