MN HF1750 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Author added Hollins
Pending: House Climate and Energy Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Author added Hollins
Pending: House Climate and Energy Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Energy Transition Legacy Office established, transition communities and worker advisory committee created, state transition plan development required for communities and workers impacted by power plan retirement, and money appropriated.
Title
Energy Transition Legacy Office established, transition communities and worker advisory committee created, state transition plan development required for communities and workers impacted by power plan retirement, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Shelly Christensen [D] | Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Rep. Dave Lislegard [D] | Rep. Patty Acomb [D] |
Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Spencer Igo [R] | Rep. Shane Mekeland [R] | Rep. Athena Hollins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Author added Hollins |
2021-03-17 | House | Author added Mekeland |
2021-03-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Climate and Energy Finance and Policy |
2021-03-08 | House | Authors added Long, Lislegard, Acomb, Lee and Igo |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Workforce and Business Development Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1566 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance