MN HF1770 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on February 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-23 - Secretary of State Chapter 122 02/22/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on February 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-23 - Secretary of State Chapter 122 02/22/12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Teacher candidates required to pass basic skills exam.
Title
Teacher candidates required to pass basic skills exam.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-13 - House - Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - Amendment (Y: 29 N: 104 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-13 - House - Amendment (Y: 29 N: 104 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-23 | Secretary of State Chapter 122 02/22/12 | |
2012-02-22 | Governor's action Approval | |
2012-02-22 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2012-02-20 | House | Returned from Senate |
2012-02-20 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 60-1 |
2012-02-20 | Senate | Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Second reading |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1493 |
2012-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration |
2012-02-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2012-02-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2012-02-15 | House | Author added Dettmer |
2012-02-13 | House | Bill was passed vote: 132-0 |
2012-02-13 | House | Third reading |
2012-02-13 | House | Amendments offered |
2012-02-09 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day |
2012-02-01 | House | Author added Scalze |
2012-01-30 | House | Second reading |
2012-01-30 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2012-01-26 | House | Author added Myhra |
2012-01-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Reform |