MN HF1844 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Author added Fischer.
Pending: House Transportation Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Author added Fischer.
Pending: House Transportation Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Freight railroad preservation and improvement grants provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Freight railroad preservation and improvement grants provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Author added Fischer. |
2017-03-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Transportation Finance |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation and Regional Governance Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2093 (Similar To) 2017-03-16 - Author added Anderson, B.