MN HF1872 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - Author added Hamilton
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - Author added Hamilton
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Pharmacy benefit manager maximum allowable cost pricing disclosed.
Title
Pharmacy benefit manager maximum allowable cost pricing disclosed.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Atkins [D] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Rep. Will Morgan [D] |
Rep. Andrew Falk [D] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Author added Hamilton |
2014-03-24 | House | Second reading |
2014-03-24 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2014-03-20 | House | Author added Falk |
2014-03-10 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2014-02-27 | House | Author added Morgan |
2014-02-25 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |