MN HF1885 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-30 - Author added Tillberry
Pending: House Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-30 - Author added Tillberry
Pending: House Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposed amendment to the Minnesota Constitution recognizing marriage as only a union between one man and one woman repealed.
Title
Proposed amendment to the Minnesota Constitution recognizing marriage as only a union between one man and one woman repealed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | House | Author added Tillberry |
2012-02-16 | House | Author added Allen |
2012-02-09 | House | Author added Johnson |
2012-01-30 | House | Author added Simon |
2012-01-26 | House | Authors added Davnie and Paymar |
2012-01-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF1885&ssn=0&y=2011 |
Text | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/bin/getbill.php?number=HF1885&version=0&session=ls87 |