MN HF1954 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-02 - Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-02 - Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Counties and cities required to report additional budgetary information.
Title
Counties and cities required to report additional budgetary information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-02 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2012-03-26 | House | Author stricken Gruenhagen |
2012-02-22 | House | Referred by Chair to Property and Local Tax Division |
2012-02-20 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2012-02-15 | House | Committee report, to pass and re-refer to State Government Finance |
2012-02-13 | House | Author added Doepke |
2012-01-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections |