MN HF2050 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-02 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Health policy bill.
Title
Health policy bill.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2023-05-02 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2023-05-01 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2212 |
2023-03-16 | House | Second reading |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2023-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2212 (Similar To) 2023-05-02 - Second reading