MN HF2059 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-01 - Author added Lueck.
Pending: House Property Tax and Local Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-01 - Author added Lueck.
Pending: House Property Tax and Local Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Payment in lieu of taxes provisions modified for large forest easement lands, and money appropriated.
Title
Payment in lieu of taxes provisions modified for large forest easement lands, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. Sandy Layman [R] | Rep. Dale Lueck [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Author added Lueck. |
2017-03-10 | House | Referred by Chair to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division |
2017-03-06 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Taxes |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1679 (Similar To) 2017-03-02 - Referred to Taxes