MN HF2093 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-08 - Motion prevailed majority report laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-08 - Motion prevailed majority report laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
East Phillips Neighborhood Institute grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
East Phillips Neighborhood Institute grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] | Rep. Samantha Sencer-Mura [D] |
Rep. Andrew Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-08 - House - House: H.F. NO. 2093 (Y: 129 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House: H.F. NO. 2093 (Y: 70 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - House - House: H.F. NO. 2093 (Y: 70 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-08 | House | Motion prevailed majority report laid on table |
2023-03-08 | House | Motion to lay on the table |
2023-03-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Capital Investment question recurred |
2023-03-08 | House | Motion prevailed minority report laid on table |
2023-03-08 | House | Motion to lay on the table |
2023-03-08 | House | Minority report offered |
2023-03-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Capital Investment |
2023-03-02 | House | Author added Smith |
2023-02-27 | House | Author added Sencer-Mura |
2023-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Economic Development Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1853 (Similar To) 2023-03-23 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Capital Investment