MN HF2117 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-26 - Author added Moller
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-26 - Author added Moller
Pending: House Health Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Occupational therapist licensure compact established.
Title
Occupational therapist licensure compact established.
Sponsors
Rep. Amanda Hemmingsen-Jaeger [D] | Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] | Rep. Debra Kiel [R] | Rep. Joe Schomacker [R] |
Rep. Brion Curran [D] | Rep. Larry Kraft [D] | Rep. Natalie Zeleznikar [R] | Rep. Kelly Moller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | House | Author added Moller |
2024-02-22 | House | Author added Zeleznikar |
2023-03-13 | House | Author added Kraft |
2023-02-27 | House | Author added Curran |
2023-02-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1572 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety