MN HF2235 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-13 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-13 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Workers' compensation advisory council recommendations regarding inpatient hospital payments adopted, rulemaking authorized, and report required.
Title
Workers' compensation advisory council recommendations regarding inpatient hospital payments adopted, rulemaking authorized, and report required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | House | Second reading |
2015-05-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2015-05-08 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2015-04-23 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2015-04-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2015-04-16 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |