MN HF2251 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - Governor approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-21 - Governor approval
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Federal stimulus oversight funding provided, Minnesota law conformed to receive the federal stimulus money, Hennepin County's 2009 nonfederal share of medical assistance costs modified, eligibility for sparsity revenue authorized for the Deer River School District, higher education tuition limits adjusted, funding for MNSCU modified, and money appropriated.
Title
Federal stimulus oversight funding provided, Minnesota law conformed to receive the federal stimulus money, Hennepin County's 2009 nonfederal share of medical assistance costs modified, eligibility for sparsity revenue authorized for the Deer River School District, higher education tuition limits adjusted, funding for MNSCU modified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | Governor approval | |
2009-05-21 | Governor's action Approval | |
2009-05-21 | Presentment date | |
2009-05-21 | Presented to Governor | |
2009-05-18 | House: Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed | |
2009-05-18 | House: Bill was repassed as amended by Conference | |
2009-05-18 | House: Third reading as amended by Conference | |
2009-05-18 | House: House adopted conference committee report | |
2009-05-18 | House: Conference committee report, delete everything | |
2009-05-18 | Senate: Third reading | |
2009-05-18 | Senate: Conference committee report, delete everything | |
2009-05-18 | Senate: Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill | |
2009-05-18 | Senate: House adopted HCC report and repassed bill | |
2009-05-14 | House: Senate conferees Cohen, Clark, Berglin, Pappas, Frederickson | |
2009-05-14 | House: Senate accedes, conference committee of 5 be appointed | |
2009-05-14 | Senate: Senate conferees Cohen; Clark; Berglin; Pappas; Frederickson | |
2009-05-14 | Senate: House not concur, conference committee of 5 requested | |
2009-05-14 | Senate: Senate accedes, CC of 5 be appointed | |
2009-05-14 | Senate: House conferees Solberg; Carlson; Faust; Brynaert; Howes | |
2009-05-13 | House: House conferees Solberg, Carlson, Faust, Brynaert, Howes | |
2009-05-13 | House: House refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested | |
2009-05-13 | House: Returned from Senate with amendment | |
2009-05-13 | Senate: Third reading Passed | |
2009-05-13 | Senate: Special Order | |
2009-04-29 | Senate: Second reading | |
2009-04-29 | Senate: Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1938 | |
2009-04-28 | House: Bill was passed | |
2009-04-28 | House: Third reading | |
2009-04-28 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2009-04-28 | Senate: Received from House | |
2009-04-28 | Senate: Referred to Rules and Administration | |
2009-04-27 | House: House rule 1.22, notice of intent to place on Fiscal Calendar 04/28/09 | |
2009-04-23 | House: Second reading | |
2009-04-23 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended | |
2009-04-21 | House: Author added Bly | |
2009-04-21 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means | |
2009-04-06 | House: Division action, to pass as amended and return to Finance | |
2009-04-02 | House: Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division | |
2009-04-01 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Finance |