MN HF2284 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-09 - Author added Lillie
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-09 - Author added Lillie
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Carbon monoxide alarm requirements modified for hotel and lodging houses, and safety warning required for violation of carbon monoxide alarms.
Title
Carbon monoxide alarm requirements modified for hotel and lodging houses, and safety warning required for violation of carbon monoxide alarms.
Sponsors
Rep. Kaela Berg [D] | Rep. Jessica Hanson [D] | Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] |
Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Author added Lillie |
2021-04-06 | House | Author added Wolgamott |
2021-04-06 | House | Second reading |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2021-03-25 | House | Author added Edelson |
2021-03-25 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2021-03-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
2021-03-25 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2021-03-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
2021-03-22 | House | Authors added Stephenson, Huot and Fischer |
2021-03-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor, Industry, Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2222 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Author added Wiger