MN HF23 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-01 - Author added Jordan
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-01 - Author added Jordan
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Secretary of sate required to amend rules to recognize medical bill as proof of residence, and rulemaking authorized.
Title
Secretary of sate required to amend rules to recognize medical bill as proof of residence, and rulemaking authorized.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-01 | House | Author added Jordan |
2021-01-25 | House | Authors added Hassan and Bahner |
2021-01-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
SF66 (Similar To) 2021-01-14 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections